Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 576 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3971 Week
» 19950 Month
» 215404 Year
» 1099785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 651 m/e 05/1891
LNER (1924) 9651 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 5227 m/e 10/1946
BR 65227 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1891
J3606/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal Fri 11/08/1961 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 10/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 70 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/03/1959
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
61C Keith 4w/e 29/08/1959
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 26/09/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn 11/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 29/08/1959
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   11/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as NBR Number 651
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
06/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
06/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9651    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5227    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65227    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65227 from Bathgate (64F)    
10/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev