Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19126 Week
» 72142 Month
» 191669 Year
» 3218522 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
650 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9650 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5226 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65226 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1951 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
60 yrs |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1891 |
|
|
Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD |
m/e |
10/1917 |
|
|
Returned from Service with the WD/ROD |
m/e |
05/1919 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1951 |
52C |
|
Blaydon |
w/e |
24/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
w/e |
24/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1915 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1915 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/05/1948 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 2/5, Nos. 62482 Glen Mamie and 69187 were noted here lettered 'British Railways,' the latter having the number on the bunker above the L.N.E.R. cast number plate. These are the first two ex N.B.R. engines noted from Cowlairs lettered 'British Railways' and carrying the new numbers, previous types so noted being of classes 'B.1,' 'D.11,' and 'K.2.' On 18/4, 'J.36' No. 65236 (late 9660) was noted here ex shops with its name Horne restored in proper shaded transfer letters, but still lettered L.N.E.R., No. 5226 (late 9650) has also been noted with the name Haig restored. These are both stationed at Kipps. |
SLS/194806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 650 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1917 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1919 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1919 |
Naming |
Named 'HAIG' |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9650 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5226 |
|
|
12/1947 |
Naming |
Renamed 'HAIG' |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65226 but not taken up |
|
|
04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5226 from Blaydon (52c) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|
24/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|