Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
646 |
m/e |
02/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9646 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5222 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65222 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/11/1963 off Grangemouth (65F) |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1891 |
|
|
Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD |
m/e |
10/1917 |
|
|
Returned from Service with the WD/ROD |
m/e |
05/1919 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65F |
|
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1913 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1913 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 62275, 4479/80, 64489, 65222/41/50/94, ex-L.M.S. Nos. 4181, 4257, 15198, 15234, 55263. 16251, 16325, 17357, 17405/33. |
SLS/195005 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 646 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1913 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1917 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1919 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1919 |
Naming |
Named 'SOMME' |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9646 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5222 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Naming |
Renamed 'SOMME' |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65222 |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65222 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|