Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 790 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2651 Week
» 23633 Month
» 165587 Year
» 1049968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 176 m/e 04/1890
LNER (1924) 9176 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 5217 m/e 07/1946
BR 65217 m/e 11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1919 FRENCH (removed 07/1928)
1938 FRENCH (removed 03/1946)
11/1948 FRENCH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3604/1890
J3607/1913
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1890
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 72 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD m/e 10/1917
   Returned from Service with the WD/ROD m/e 05/1919
? (Reinstated) m/e 10/1939
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 13/02/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC KPS Kipps w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 13/02/1960
WDN   w/e 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1913 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1913 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1890 To Service To service as NBR Number 176
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1913 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1917 Allocation      
05/1919 Allocation      
05/1919 Naming Named 'FRENCH'    
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9176    
1938 Naming Renamed 'FRENCH'    
10/1939 Reinstated      
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5217    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
11/1948 Naming Renamed 'FRENCH'    
11/1948 Naming Renamed 'FRENCH'    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65217    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65217 from Grangemouth (65F)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev