|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
01/10/1949 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61513/43, 62281, 4476/87, 5218/59, 65274, 5276, 65321, 68467, 69129, ex L.M.S. 4189/94, 15268, 16352, 17288, 57306. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1890 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 632 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
||
05/1914 | Modification | Diagram 81 boiler fitted | ||
05/1914 | Modification | Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted | ||
02/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9632 | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5218 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65218 | ||
02/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65218 from Eastfield (65A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |