Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 215 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 16194 Month
» 211648 Year
» 1096029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 628 m/e 01/1890
LNER (1924) 9628 m/e 11/1926
LNER (1946) 5216 m/e 11/1946
BR 65216 m/e 09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1919 BYNG (removed 09/1939)
06/1949 BYNG

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1890
J3606/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1890
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/04/1962 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 04/1963 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 72 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD m/e 10/1917
   Returned from Service with the WD/ROD m/e 04/1919
? (Reinstated) m/e 09/1939
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 8w/e 22/12/1956
65E Kipps 4w/e 12/03/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 12/03/1960
WDN   30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1915 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
06/1915 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1890 To Service To service as NBR Number 628
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
06/1915 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
06/1915 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1917 Allocation      
04/1919 Allocation      
04/1919 Naming Named 'BYNG'    
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9628    
09/1939 Reinstated      
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5216    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65216    
06/1949 Naming Renamed 'BYNG'    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
30/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65216 from Kipps (65E)    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by McLellans: Langloan    

prev prev