Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 48 Today
» 788 Yesterday
» 48 Week
» 13081 Month
» 235482 Year
» 1119863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 625 m/e 01/1890
LNER (1924) 9625 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 5215 m/e 07/1946
BR 65215 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1890
J3606/1914
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1890
Withdrawal Thu 13/04/1950 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 05/1950 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 60 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 13/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FTW   9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC KPS Kipps 03/08/1947
WDN 65E Kipps 13/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1914 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1914 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
07/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1890 To Service To service as NBR Number 625
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
06/1914 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
06/1914 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9625    
07/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
07/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5215    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65215    
04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 65215 from Kipps (65E)    
05/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev