Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 623   01/1890
LNER (1924) 9623   03/1924
LNER (1946) 5214   09/1946
BR 65214   03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1890
J3612/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1890
Withdrawal During 11/1963 off Ardrossan (67D)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 73 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 18/11/1961
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 2w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   14/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1916 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1916 Diagram 81 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1890 To Service To service as NBR Number 623
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1916 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1916 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9623    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5214    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65214    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65214 from Ardrossan (67D)    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev