Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 622   11/1889
LNER (1924) 9622   10/1925
LNER (1946) 5213   06/1946
BR 65213   10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3611/1889
J3610/1914
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1889
Withdrawal During 04/1957 off Kittybrewster (61A)
Scrapping During 05/1957 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 67 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
? (Reinstated) m/e 09/1939
PTH Perth (LNER) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 29/11/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 30/04/1950
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   15/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1914 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
10/1914 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
11/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1889 To Service To service as NBR Number 622
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1914 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1914 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9622    
09/1939 Reinstated      
11/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5213    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
10/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 65213    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 65213 from Kittybrewster (61A)    
05/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev