Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 617   09/1889
LNER (1924) 9617   11/1925
LNER (1946) 5211   07/1946
BR 65211   10/1948

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 09/1946
LNER Black Unlined 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3609/1889
J3610/1913
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 09/1889
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 72 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/05/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 18/05/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
10/1913 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1889 To Service To service as NBR Number 617
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1913 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9617    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5211    
09/1946 Livery Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
10/1948 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65211    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65211 from Parkhead (65C)    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev