Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2332 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32982 Week
» 131627 Month
» 334291 Year
» 3361144 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
58 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9058 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4517 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
64517 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/10/1958 |
Service Life |
48 yrs , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1910 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64C |
|
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Edinburgh Dalry Road - stored locomotives |
55165/202/33, also 64500/17 and 69187 'out of use.' |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 58 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9058 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4517 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64517 |
|
|
15/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
17/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64517 |
|
|