11/03/1961 |
Polmont MPD (in store) |
On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. |
SLS/196104 |
13/05/1961 |
Bo\'ness MPD |
In store beyond the station beside the now closed dock-54475/83, 55222, 56169, 56370, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57338/66/73, 57411/26/9/70, 57557/76, 62689, 64471/82, 64515/35, 68325/454. |
SLS/196106 |
18/08/1961 |
Bo\'Ness docks |
Locomotives in store on 18th August were-55222, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57314/38/66/73, 57411/26/9/70/2, 57557/76, 64515/8/35, 68454. |
SLS/196109 |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |