Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1390 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25021 Week
» 89975 Month
» 292639 Year
» 3319492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
203 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9203 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4490 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64490 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L347 |
Works Number |
18886 |
To Service |
During 09/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/12/1959 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Information |
Queen's Park Works |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1909 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. |
SLS/194908 |
31/01/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. |
SLS/195003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 203 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18886 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9203 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4490 |
|
|
05/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64490 |
|
|
11/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64490 |
|
|