20/08/1947 |
Inverurie Works |
On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. |
SLS/194710 |
11/03/1961 |
Polmont MPD (in store) |
On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. |
SLS/196104 |
13/05/1961 |
Bo\'ness MPD |
In store beyond the station beside the now closed dock-54475/83, 55222, 56169, 56370, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57338/66/73, 57411/26/9/70, 57557/76, 62689, 64471/82, 64515/35, 68325/454. |
SLS/196106 |
04/07/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. |
SLS/196108 |
28/08/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard-remains only) |
Erecting Shop: D2412, D3550, D3934, D5329, D6149/56, 44281/3, 45136, 64548/59/61/86, 64612, 65931. Test Line: 44315, 64539. Works Sidings: D2417, D3547/53, D8028, 44183. Dead Line: 43902, 57572, 62682, 64636. Scrap Yard-intact: 40603, 55126, Scrap Yard-remains only: 40574/94, 40604/11/88, 43922, 55198, 56376, 57552/4, 57609, 62479, 64482, 64576. |
SLS/196110 |