Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2383 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5885 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65885 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1192 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/06/1967 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
3w/e |
30/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
8w/e |
31/12/1966 |
ALLOC |
52G |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
20/05/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/06/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 07/1943 |
Superheater removed |
by 07/1943 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/11/1966 |
Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) |
North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2383 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1192 |
|
|
07/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5885 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65885 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
07/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65885 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|