Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1053 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31703 Week
» 130348 Month
» 333012 Year
» 3359865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2355 |
m/e |
06/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5877 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65877 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1161 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/10/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 12/1944 |
Superheater removed |
by 12/1944 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 08/1952 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 09/1955 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2355 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1161 |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5877 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65877 |
|
|
08/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
29/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65877 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|