Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 492 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31142 Week
» 129787 Month
» 332451 Year
» 3359304 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1229 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5857 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65857 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5121 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/04/1963 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51K |
Saltburn |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/04/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 05/1956 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1229 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5121 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5857 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65857 |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
05/1956 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
02/04/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65857 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|