Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17235 Week
» 70251 Month
» 189778 Year
» 3216631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
67 |
m/e |
06/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5758 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65758 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 22/01/1959 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1905 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1919 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
07/1943 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 67 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1943 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5758 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65758 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
22/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65758 |
|
|