Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1939 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19742 Week
» 72758 Month
» 192285 Year
» 3219138 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1674 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5746 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65746 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/07/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
Information |
Round cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1904 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1917 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
09/1948 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1674 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5746 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65746 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65746 |
|
|