31/08/1948 |
Darlington Works |
Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August |
SLS/194810 |
11/11/1961 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. |
SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Road) |
Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. |
SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Road) |
Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. |
SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. |
SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. |
SLS/196209 |