Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1040 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14446 Week
» 67462 Month
» 186989 Year
» 3213842 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1043 |
m/e |
09/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5740 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65740 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 09/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 28/01/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1904 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1916 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
03/1944 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1043 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5740 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65740 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65740 |
|
|