Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 2430 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33080 Week
» 131725 Month
» 334389 Year
» 3361242 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
342 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5732 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65732 |
on |
03/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 04/11/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1911 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
05/1947 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 342 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5732 |
|
|
05/1947 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
03/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65732 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
04/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65732 |
|
|