Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15327 Week
» 68343 Month
» 187870 Year
» 3214723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2076 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5700 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65700 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/08/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1948 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2076 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1939 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5700 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65700 |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65700 |
|
|