Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1828 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19631 Week
» 72647 Month
» 192174 Year
» 3219027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
459 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5714 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65714 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/01/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1948 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 459 Built at Darlington Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5714 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cudworth (CUD) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65714 |
|
|
15/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65714 |
|
|