Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14894 Week
» 67910 Month
» 187437 Year
» 3214290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2048 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5687 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65687 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/08/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
w/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
19/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1941 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2048 Built at Darlington Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1941 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5687 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65687 |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
19/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65687 |
|
|