Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14258 Week
» 67274 Month
» 186801 Year
» 3213654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1725 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5672 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65672 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/05/1951 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1940 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
05/1948 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1725 Built at Darlington Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1940 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/03/1940 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5672 |
|
|
14/08/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65672 |
|
|
23/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65672 |
|
|