Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4095 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 83092 Month
» 285756 Year
» 3312609 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
139 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5067 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65067 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
132 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/11/1951 off Heaton (52B) |
Service Life |
61 yrs , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1911 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1925 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 139 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 132 |
|
|
12/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
02/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5067 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65067 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
30/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
03/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
27/11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65067 from Heaton (52B) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|