Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4280 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19892 Week
» 118537 Month
» 321201 Year
» 3348054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1253 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8253 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4673 |
|
04/1946 |
British Railways |
64673 |
|
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A81 |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/08/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1253 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8253 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4673 |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64673 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64673 |
|
|