Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2148 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19951 Week
» 72967 Month
» 192494 Year
» 3219347 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1265 |
m/e |
11/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8265 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4665 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64665 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X80 |
To Service |
During 11/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/12/1959 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1265 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8265 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4665 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64665 |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
14/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64665 |
|
|