Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1743 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19546 Week
» 72562 Month
» 192089 Year
» 3218942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1175 |
m/e |
10/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8175 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5525 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65525 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L52 |
To Service |
During 10/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/04/1959 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
27/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1175 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8175 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5525 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65525 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65525 |
|
|