Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2291 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20094 Week
» 73110 Month
» 192637 Year
» 3219490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1160 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8160 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5510 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65510 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/03/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1160 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8160 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5510 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65510 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65510 |
|
|