Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 485 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19396 Week
» 84350 Month
» 287014 Year
» 3313867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
549 |
m/e |
08/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7549 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5477 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65477 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G73 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/02/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1913 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/02/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1950 |
Colchester Station |
Quite an old-world touch was given at Colchester on Saturday, 12th August, in the morning, when an up Clacton-Cambridge train arrived behind two J15's, both of 31A. These were 65477 an 65391 (the latter with a tender-cab). Shortly afterwards, 65391 ran light from the station into Colchester Shed. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 549 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7549 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5477 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65477 |
|
|
08/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65477 |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|