Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1647 Today
» 4706 Yesterday
» 23216 Week
» 14272 Month
» 360696 Year
» 3387549 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
548 |
m/e |
08/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7548 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5476 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65476 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G73 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/09/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
10/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
11/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 548 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7548 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5476 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65476 |
|
|
11/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65476 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|