Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 627 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19538 Week
» 84492 Month
» 287156 Year
» 3314009 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
543 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7543 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5471 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65471 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G73 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/06/1960 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 543 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7543 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5471 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65471 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
17/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65471 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|