Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15001 Week
» 68017 Month
» 187544 Year
» 3214397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
515 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7515 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5434 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65434 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/11/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 515 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7515 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5434 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65434 |
|
|
16/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
16/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65434 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|