Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2573 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15979 Week
» 68995 Month
» 188522 Year
» 3215375 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
514 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7514 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5433 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65433 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/02/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 514 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7514 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5433 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65433 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65433 |
|
|