Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1657 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15063 Week
» 68079 Month
» 187606 Year
» 3214459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
511 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7511 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5431 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65431 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/03/1951 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1899 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
12/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 511 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7511 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5431 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65431 |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65431 |
|
|