Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1952 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15358 Week
» 68374 Month
» 187901 Year
» 3214754 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
836 |
m/e |
07/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7836 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5361 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65361 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T22 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1889 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 10/1944 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (On Shed Ex Wks.) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 836 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7836 |
|
|
10/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5361 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65361 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65361 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|