Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
294 |
m/e |
05/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5294 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4409 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64409 |
m/e |
11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/12/1958 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1907 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1933 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 294 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5294 |
|
|
08/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4409 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64409 |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64409 |
|
|