Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
241 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5241 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4365 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64365 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/08/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1904 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
5w/e |
20/04/1957 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
4w/e |
08/01/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/08/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1933 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 241 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5241 |
|
|
01/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4365 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64365 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
17/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64365 |
|
|