Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 39 Online
» 865 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 9809 Week
» 865 Month
» 347289 Year
» 3374142 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
177 |
m/e |
11/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5177 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4354 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64354 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 21/10/1962 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1941 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/12/1960 |
Gorton MPD |
Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 177 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5177 |
|
|
08/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4354 |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64354 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
21/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64354 |
|
|