Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3791 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 8944 Week
» 143760 Month
» 346424 Year
» 3373277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
225 |
m/e |
04/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5225 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4346 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64346 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4550 |
To Service |
During 04/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1915 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/1924 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
09/1934 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 225 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4550 |
|
|
02/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5225 |
|
|
09/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4346 |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64346 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (41K) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (41K) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
23/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64346 |
|
|