Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1383 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14789 Week
» 67805 Month
» 187332 Year
» 3214185 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1004 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6004 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4311 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64311 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6066 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/01/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1902 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WIG |
Lower Ince |
on |
17/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
on |
12/12/1946 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1916 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1923 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
11/1936 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1004 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6066 |
|
|
05/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6004 |
|
|
11/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4311 |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64311 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64311 |
|
|