Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 676 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14082 Week
» 67098 Month
» 186625 Year
» 3213478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
995 |
m/e |
01/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5995 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4302 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64302 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6057 |
To Service |
During 01/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 30/09/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1902 |
36D |
|
Barnsley |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEX |
Mexborough |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/03/1948 |
Gorton Works |
On 22/3 the following locomotives were observed renumbered: in the Erecting Shop Nos. 63765, 64302, 65197 an 69326, while outside the Erecting Shop were Nos. 62664 an 64407. Also recently ex works were Nos. E3243 and E9288, which apparently are the last locomotives to leave Gorton Works, bearing the short-lived prefix E. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 995 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6057 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5995 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4302 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64302 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
30/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64302 |
|
|