Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
974 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5974 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4281 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64281 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6036 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/11/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1932 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 974 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6036 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5974 |
|
|
01/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4281 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64281 |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64281 |
|
|