Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3190 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33840 Week
» 132485 Month
» 335149 Year
» 3362002 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
132 |
|
05/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5132 |
|
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5203 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65203 |
|
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1956 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/10/1952 |
Altrincham |
Passenger traffic on the Altrincham-Northwich-Chester line is handled mainly by D.10's, supplemented by ex-L.M.S. '2P' 4-4-0's. Other types noted recently include Compound 41168 and 2-6-4T 2452. '8F' 2-8-0's handle the bulk of the freights, including all the I.C.I. lime specials between Tunstead and Winnington. J.10's are becoming rare, although 65200 an 65203 are seen from time to time. Through freights from Mottram Yard to the Birkenhead side of the Mersey are usually worked by O.4's. The daily coal train from Longsight has been handled for over 12 months by 43717, while the morning freight from Manchester (invariably a 10C turn) is horsed by various 'black 5's' from that shed, or occasionally by an 0-8-0 'Super-D.' |
SLS/195212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 132 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5132 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5203 |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65203 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65203 |
|
|