Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33803 Week
» 132448 Month
» 335112 Year
» 3361965 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
828 |
|
01/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5828 |
|
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5157 |
|
02/1946 |
British Railways |
65157 |
|
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3746 |
To Service |
During 01/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/08/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/06/1961 |
Wigan Springs Branch MPD |
The last two J10s (65157/98) are in store at Springs Branch. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 828 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3746 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5828 |
|
|
02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5157 |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65157 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65157 |
|
|