Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3098 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33748 Week
» 132393 Month
» 335057 Year
» 3361910 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
586 |
m/e |
09/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3586 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4235 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64235 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
1446 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/12/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
w/e |
04/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 586 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1446 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3586 |
|
|
07/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4235 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64235 |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64235 |
|
|