|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | Two G.N. visitors, 'J.52' 4048 and 4231, make a change by occasional visits to Liverpool Street. where 'Super-Clauds' are getting rarer than ever, Cambridge and Clacton turns most often producing them. It is good to see the 'B.12' bearing their original G.E. numbers again. Electrification will no doubt cut deeply into the G.E. veterans | SLS/194701 |
11/05/1958 | Spalding MPD | Spalding, ex M. & G.N. shed is no longer supplied by New England but by Boston. On 11th May the following were on shed-D2234, 43059/ 61/2/4/5/80/3/5, 61756, 64171/2/91, 64231 /78 an 68560 all of Boston (40F). | SLS/195806 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 582 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1442 |
||
02/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3582 | ||
03/1941 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4231 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64231 | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
08/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
02/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64231 |