Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14841 Week
» 79795 Month
» 282459 Year
» 3309312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
563 |
m/e |
08/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3563 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4212 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64212 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1398 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 14/12/1955 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 563 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1398 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3563 |
|
|
12/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4212 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64212 |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64212 |
|
|